EP1214942 - Use of dendritic cells, loaded with bacteriophages which carry a tumour-specific and/or tumour-associated antigen on their surface, for treatment of tumours [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apalexo Biotechnologie GmbH Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE | [2003/17] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Apalexo Biotechnologie GmbH Am Klopferspitz 19 82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Immunogenec Biotechnologie GmbH Am Klopferspitz 19 82152 Planegg/Martinsried / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohnisch, Tim Stiftsbogen, 57 81375 Munchen / DE | 02 /
Pachmann, Katharina Brandenburgerstrasse, 30 95448 Bayreuth / DE | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003333.8 | 17.05.1999 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | DE1998121925 | 15.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821925 | WO1999EP03353 | 14.05.1999 Original published format: PCT/EP99/03353 | [2002/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1214942 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1214942 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/385, A61P35/00, A61P37/04 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
C40B40/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N15/1037 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/26] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung von mit Bacteriophagen, die ein tumorspezifisches und/oder tumorassoziliertes Antigen auf ihrer Oberfläche tragen, beladenen dendritischen Zellen zur Behandlung von Tumoren | [2002/25] | English: | Use of dendritic cells, loaded with bacteriophages which carry a tumour-specific and/or tumour-associated antigen on their surface, for treatment of tumours | [2002/25] | French: | Utilisation de cellules dendritiques, chargées avec des bactériophages qui portent à leur surface un antigène spécifique et/ou associé à une tumeur, pour le traitement de tumeurs | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99924991.5 / EP1077720 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9207077 (PERHAM RICHARD NELSON [GB], et al) [YD] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * page 4, line 33 - page 6, line 10 * * page 8, line 8 - line 22 * * page 19, line 32 - page 20, line 37 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]WO9531107 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 1 - line 9 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 5 * * examples 4,5,11 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]US5674486 (SOBOL ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 38 - line 51 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 32 ** claims 1-12,19-21,25-36,42,43 *; | [Y] - ROEHNISCH T ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF LYMPHOMASPECIFIC IDIOTYPE VACCINE FOR INDUCTION OF A SPECIFIC CYTOTOXIC IMMUNE RESPONSE", ANNALS OF HEMATOLOGY, BERLIN, DE, (1996), vol. 73, no. SUPPL 2, ISSN 0939-5555, page A154, XP000857050 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * the whole document * |