EP1336956 - Method, system and computer program for recognizing speech/speaker using emotional state change to govern unsupervised adaptation of the recognition process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/34] | Method for recognizing speech/speaker using emotional change to govern unsupervised adaptation | ||
[2006/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2007/24] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20 50829 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Sony International (Europe) GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kemp, Thomas, Advanced Technology Center Stuttgart SONY Deutschland GmbH, Hedelfingerstr. 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/27] |
Former [2003/34] | 01 /
Kemp, Thomas, Advanced Technology Center Stuttgart Sony Intl. (Europe) GmbH, Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 1 70327 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003337.9 | 13.02.2002 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1336956 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1336956 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/06, G10L17/00 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
G10L15/065 (EP,US);
G10L17/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, System und Computer Programm zur Sprach-/Sprechererkennung unter Verwendung einer Emotionszustandsänderung für die unüberwachte Anpassung des Erkennungsverfahren | [2006/11] | English: | Method, system and computer program for recognizing speech/speaker using emotional state change to govern unsupervised adaptation of the recognition process | [2006/10] | French: | Procédé, système et logiciel pour la reconnaissance de la parole ou d'un locuteur utilisant un changement de l'état émotionnel pour l'adaptation non supervisée de l'étape de reconnaissance | [2006/10] |
Former [2003/34] | Verfahren zur Sprach-/Sprechererkennung unter Verwendung einer Gemütszustandsänderung für die unüberwachte Anpassung des Erkenners | ||
Former [2003/34] | Method for recognizing speech/speaker using emotional change to govern unsupervised adaptation | ||
Former [2003/34] | Méthode pour la reconnaissance de la parole ou d'un locuteur faisant appel a un changement émotionnel pour l'adaptation non supervisée du dispositif de reconnaissance | Examination procedure | 23.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0470411 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 12 - line 40; claim 1 *; | [A]US5987415 (BREESE JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; claims 1-7 * * column 12, line 48 - column 13, line 43; figure 6 *; | [A]EP1022725 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* claims 1-3 *; | [X]GB2348035 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - page 4, line 11 * * page 8, line 11 - line 18 * * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 40 *; | [A] - SAMUDRAVIJAYA K ET AL, "Pre-recognition measures of speaking rate", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980401), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 73 - 84, XP004148061 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-6393(97)00063-0 |