EP1203812 - Attenuated pestiviruses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2005/48] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMEDICA GMBH 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyers, Gregor Albstrasse 1 72141 Walddorfhaeslach / DE | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Kläs, Heinz-Gerd, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim/Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Kläs, Heinz-Gerd, Dr., et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim/Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2002/19] | Laudien, Dieter, Dr. Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH, B Patent 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003407.0 | 26.05.1999 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | EP19980110356 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98110356 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1203812 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1203812 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203812 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, C12N7/04, A61K48/00, C12Q1/70 | [2004/06] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2002/19] | C12N7/04, C12N15/40, C12N15/55, A61K48/00, A61K35/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Extension states | LT | 04.08.2004 | LV | 04.08.2004 | RO | 04.08.2004 | SI | 04.08.2004 | Title | German: | Attenuierte Pestiviren | [2002/19] | English: | Attenuated pestiviruses | [2002/19] | French: | Pestivirus atténués | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 17.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99926430.2 / EP1084251 | Divisional application(s) | EP05017098.4 / EP1614423 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY] - M.M. HULST ET AL., "Inactivation of the RNase activity of Glycoprotein Erns of Classical Swine Fever Virus results in a cytopathogenic virus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., ICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY US, (199801), vol. 72, no. 1, pages 151 - 157, XP002095266 [DY] 1-17 * abstract * * page 152, column L, paragraph 5 * * page 153, column L, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - WINDISCH J M ET AL, "RNase of classical swine fever virus: biochemical characterization and inhibition by virus-neutralizing monoclonal antibodies.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1996 JAN) 70 (1) 352-8. JOURNAL CODE: KCV. ISSN: 0022-538X., United States, XP002095267 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * page 352, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 356, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 357, column R, paragraph L * |