EP1233428 - Solenoid driver circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehara, Takayuki Max Co.Ltd., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Turi, Michael, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003668.7 | 18.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | JP20010042071 | 19.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001042071 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233428 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/18, B26D5/08 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
B26D5/086 (EP,US);
H01F7/18 (KR);
B26D5/08 (EP,US);
H01F7/1844 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/20] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektromagnetsteuerschaltung | [2002/34] | English: | Solenoid driver circuit | [2002/34] | French: | Circuit de contrôle d'un solénoide | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 22.02.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/50] | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0779631 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1 * page 13, line 50 - page 14, line 11; figures 2,3; claim 1 * [Y] 1; | [X]JPH08254280 ; | [Y]JPH07290895 ; | [X]CA2221667 (ORVITEK INC [CA]) [X] 1 * page 7 - page 8; figure 4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08254280 A 19961001 (AISIN AW CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07290895 A 19951107 (ROLAND D G KK) [Y] 1 * abstract * |