EP1233524 - Apparatus and method for generating and decoding codes in communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Min-Goo 973-3, Youngton-dong, Paltal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jang, Jae-Sung Jukong Apt. 1102-203, Chungang-dong Kwachon-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Ha, Sang-Hyuck 945-955, Youngton-dong, Paltal-gu Suwon-shi, Kyounggi-do / KR | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003682.8 | 18.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | KR20010007916 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: KR 2001007916 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1233524 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1233524 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233524 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29, H03M13/00, H03M13/37, H04L1/00 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
H03M13/2771 (EP,US);
H03M13/27 (KR);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US);
H03M13/6306 (EP,US);
H03M13/6362 (EP,US);
H03M13/6387 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, IT, SE [2003/51] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zur Kodenerzeugung und Dekodierung in Kommunikationssystem | [2002/34] | English: | Apparatus and method for generating and decoding codes in communication system | [2002/34] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour générer et décoder des codes dans un système de communication | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 07.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 08.04.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 20.06.2005 | Appeal received No. T1137/05 | 18.08.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.09.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 28.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 01.04.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/49] | FI | 01.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1231735 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-33 * page 2, line 1 - page 8, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [E]EP1231737 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-33 * page 3, line 46 - line 47 *; | [E]EP1199835 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,2,6,8,10,18,27 * page 7, line 44 - line 47; figures 4-6 * | [A] - "3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP);TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP RADIO ACCESS NETWORK MULTIPLEXING AND CHANNEL CODING (FDD) (3G TS 25.212 VERSION 3.0.0)", 3G TS 25 212 V3.0.0, XX, XX, (199910), page COMPLETE54, XP002149187 [A] 1,2,6,8,10,18,27 * paragraph [4.1.3.2] * * paragraph [4.2.7] * |