EP1232962 - A flexible anti-shock and/or anti-scratch sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | 09.10.2009 | Request for conversion to national application | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Propack S.p.A. Via Rosa Luxemburg, 6 10093 Collegno (Torino) / IT | [2002/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaula, Dante Via San Giacomo 12/C 10091 Alpignano, (Torino) / IT | 02 /
La Castellana, Rocco Corso Torino 14 10095 Grugliasco, (Torino) / IT | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Rondano, Davide, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Rondano, Davide, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2002/34] | Serra, Francesco, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02003716.4 | 19.02.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00150 | 20.02.2001 Original published format: IT TO010150 | [2002/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232962 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/03, B29C59/02 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
B65D81/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/34] | Title | German: | Biegsame stossdämpfende und/oder kratzfeste Folie | [2002/34] | English: | A flexible anti-shock and/or anti-scratch sheet | [2002/34] | French: | Feuille souple antichoc et/ou de protection contre les rayures | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | 04.08.2009 | Request for conversion into a national application, for DE/ES [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3574809 (FAIRBANKS THEODORE H, et al) [X] 1-4* column 5, lines 5-45; figure - *; | [X]GB2089460 (INTERTUBE, et al) [X] 1-4 * page 2, lines 14-28; figure 4 *; | [X]US4499040 (MAEMOTO KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * | Examination | GB2250232 | EP0767210 | JPH09109303 | JPH09131846 |