EP1239590 - Method and phase locked loop for synchronization to a subcarrier that is comprised in a wanted signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2009/39] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Boering-Str. 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Harman/Becker Automotive Systems ( Becker Division) GmbH Abt. Patente Im Stöckmädle 1 76307 Karlsbad / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gierl, Stefan Moltkestrasse 41 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Benz, Christoph Bühlweg 34 77797 Ohlsbach / DE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003863.4 | 21.02.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | DE2001111402 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10111402 | [2002/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239590 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239590 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03J7/04 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H03J7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Phasenregelkreis zur Synchronisation auf einen in einem Nutzsignal enthaltenen Hilfsträger | [2002/37] | English: | Method and phase locked loop for synchronization to a subcarrier that is comprised in a wanted signal | [2002/37] | French: | Méthode et boucle à verrouillage de phase pour la synchronisation sur une sous-porteuse qui est comprise dans un signal utile | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.09.2009 | DK | 23.09.2009 | FI | 23.09.2009 | IE | 23.09.2009 | IT | 23.09.2009 | NL | 23.09.2009 | SE | 23.09.2009 | TR | 23.09.2009 | GR | 24.12.2009 | ES | 03.01.2010 | PT | 25.01.2010 | AT | 21.02.2010 | LU | 21.02.2010 | BE | 28.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
IT | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
AT | 21.02.2010 | ||
LU | 21.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
IT | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
AT | 21.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
IT | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
IE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 23.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2135844 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]US4703340 (BALABAN ALVIN R [US], et al) [A] 2-4,16-18 * column 6, line 34 - line 53 *; | [A]EP0512606 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0594403 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,14 * figures 1,4 * | Examination | EP0516379 | DE19738914 |