EP1239616 - Method and System for demodulating an RDS-Signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Goering-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Harman/Becker Automotive Systems (Becker Division) GmbH Im Stöckmädle 1 76307 Karlsbad / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gierl, Stefan, Dr.-Ing. Moltkestrasse 41 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Benz, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing. Bühlweg 34 77797 Ohlsbach / DE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003953.3 | 22.02.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | DE2001111590 | 10.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10111590 | [2002/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239616 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1239616 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239616 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H03D1/22 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H04H40/18 (EP,US);
H04H40/54 (EP,US);
H04H20/34 (EP,US);
H04H2201/13 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/37] | H04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zur Demodulation des RDS-Signals | [2002/37] | English: | Method and System for demodulating an RDS-Signal | [2002/37] | French: | Procédé et Dispositif pour la Démodulation d'un Signal RDS | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 06.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.09.2004 | IE | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | TR | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | AT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 22.02.2005 | LU | 22.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
CY | 22.02.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4827515 (REICH WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0350663 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]EP0471412 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |