EP1235204 - Method and apparatus for selecting an excitation coding mode for speech coding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tasaki, Hirohisa Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/35] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02003974.9 | 22.02.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | JP20010052944 | 27.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001052944 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1235204 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1235204 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1235204 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/14, G10L19/08, G10L19/00 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
G10L19/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/35] | G10L19/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/29] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Auswahl des Kodierungsmodus der Anregung zur Sprachkodierung | [2002/35] | English: | Method and apparatus for selecting an excitation coding mode for speech coding | [2002/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de sélection du mode de codage pour l'excitation d'un codeur de parole | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0030075 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,7,8,10-17 * page 12, line 19 - line 23; claim 9 * * claims 7,9,15 * * claim 10 * * page 12, line 19 - line 23; claim 5 * * page 12, line 9 - line 11; claims 1,5,7,15 * * page 12, line 9 - line 11; claims 1,5 * * page 12, line 24 - line 30 * * page 4, line 1 - line 4; claims 3,7,15 * * page 10, line 7 - line 8 * * page 8, line 25 - line 35 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 8 *; | [Y]EP1052620 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7,8,10-17 * page 5, column 8, line 21 - line 26; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 5, column 8, line 33 - line 37; figure 1 * * page 2, column 2, line 11 - line 19; claim 1 * * page 5, column 8, lines 27-33; claim 11 * * abstract *; | [A] - DAS A ET AL, "Multimode variable bit rate speech coding: an efficient paradigm for high-quality low-rate representation of speech signal", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1999. PROCEEDINGS., 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PHOENIX, AZ, USA 15-19 MARCH 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990315), ISBN 0-7803-5041-3, pages 2307 - 2310, XP010327890 [A] 1-17 * abstract, sections 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1999.758399 | [A] - PAKSOY E ET AL, "Variable rate speech coding with phonetic segmentation", STATISTICAL SIGNAL AND ARRAY PROCESSING. MINNEAPOLIS, APR. 27 - 30, 1993, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930427), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-0946-4, pages 155 - 158, XP010110417 [A] 1-17 * abstract, sections 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319256 | Examination | WO0030075 | EP1052620 |