EP1239609 - Antenna switched diversity receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takai, Hitoshi 3-17-11, Higashi-Tokiwadai, Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Yamasaki, Hidetoshi 9-39-7, Higashi-Sonoda-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Urabe, Yoshio 5-12-35, Tawaradai Shijonawate-shi Osaka-fu 575-0013 / JP | [2002/38] |
Former [2002/37] | 01 /
Takai, Hitoshi 3-17-11, Higashi-Tokiwadai, Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Yamasaki, Hidetoshi 9-39-7, Higashi-Sonoda-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo / JP | |||
03 /
Urabe, Yoshio 1-10-16, Fujinosato Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02004164.6 | 15.04.1994 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | JP19930089615 | 16.04.1993 Original published format: JP 8961593 | JP19930089616 | 16.04.1993 Original published format: JP 8961693 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239609 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1239609 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239609 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08, H04L1/06 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H04B7/0888 (EP,US);
H04B7/0814 (EP,US);
H04B7/082 (EP,US);
H04L1/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/37] | H04B7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL, SE [2002/37] | Title | German: | Diversitätsempfänger mit Antennenumschaltung | [2002/37] | English: | Antenna switched diversity receiver | [2002/37] | French: | Récepteur en diversité à commutation d'antenne | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 25.06.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94302691.4 / EP0620657 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0447729 ; | [A]JPH048031 ; | [A]EP0095165 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 7, line 6 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0400983 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 1 ** figure 2 *; | [A] - AKWAIWA Y, "ANTENNA SELECTION DIVERSITY FOR FRAMED DIGITAL SIGNAL TRANSMISSION IN MOBILERADIO CHANNEL", GATEWAY TO NEW CONCEPTS IN VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY. SAN FRANCISCO, MAY 1 - 3, 1989., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19890501), vol. 2, pages 890 - 473, XP002227080 [A] 1-10 * vol.II, pages 470-473, * * Y.AKAIWA: * * "ANTENNA SELECTION DIVERSITY FOR FRAMED DIGITAL SIGNAL TRANSMISSION IN MOBILE RADIO CHANNEL" * * page 470, column L, line 2 - column R, line 18 * * page 470, column R, line 32 - page 471, column L, line 19 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920529), vol. 16, no. 236, Database accession no. (E - 1210), & JP04047729 A 19920217 (CLARION) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920415), vol. 16, no. 154, Database accession no. (E - 1190), & JP04008031 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |