EP1236587 - Vehicle tyre with an asymmetric tread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hindriks, Günter Ostende 37 49828 Georgsdorf / DE | [2002/36] | Application number, filing date | 02004166.1 | 26.02.2002 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | DE2001110238 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10110238 | [2002/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1236587 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1236587 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236587 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/03, B60C3/06, B60C19/00, B60C11/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
B60C19/001 (EP);
B60C11/00 (EP);
B60C11/005 (EP);
B60C11/0058 (EP);
B60C11/033 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/36] | B60C11/03, B60C3/06, B60C19/00, B60C11/00, // B60C111:00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/18] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugluftreifen mit einem asymmetrischen Laufstreifen | [2002/36] | English: | Vehicle tyre with an asymmetric tread | [2002/36] | French: | Bandage pneumatique pour véhicule avec une bande de roulement asymétrique | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11321237 ; | [A]JPH04271902 ; | [A]GB1255952 (DUNLOP HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [A] 4,5 * page 1, line 49 - line 60 *; | [X]US3853164 (MIRTAIN H) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 62 - line 40 * * column 3, line 35 - line 40; figures 5,6; claim - *; | [X]US3916968 (MASSON YVES) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 4, line 3 - line 16; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0572127 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 12 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 28 *; | [X]US5622575 (MEYER-ADLUNG JOBST [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 7, line 1 - line 22 *; | [DA]DE19812934 (PIRELLI REIFENWERK GMBH & CO K [DE]) [DA] 1,3 * page 3, line 33 - line 36; figure 2; table 1 * * page 4, line 18 *; | [E]EP1184205 (DUNLOP GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,3,7 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 19; figure -; claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11321237 A 19991124 (TOYO TIRE &RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1,3,6,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930208), vol. 017, no. 064, Database accession no. (M - 1364), & JP04271902 A 19920928 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 11 * abstract * |