EP1238892 - Parking assisting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Satoshi, c/o K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Shimazaki, Kazunori, c/o K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004200.8 | 26.02.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | JP20010063338 | 07.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001063338 | JP20010194870 | 27.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001194870 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238892 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1238892 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238892 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/02 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
B62D15/028 (EP,US);
G08G1/14 (KR);
B60T2201/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Parkhilfseinrichtung | [2002/37] | English: | Parking assisting device | [2002/37] | French: | Appareil d'assistance au parking | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | IE | 26.02.2007 | LU | 26.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CY | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 26.02.2007 | ||
LU | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2728859 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]DE19646559 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-5,11,15,16 * the whole document * * column 3, line 4 - line 19; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19809416 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,11,15-18 * the whole document * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 21; figure - * * column 3, line 55 - line 60 * * column 3, line 64 - line 67 *; | [A]US6070684 (SHIMIZU YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,15,16 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 12 * * column 6, line 64 - line 67 *; | [X]JP2000280823 (AISIN SEIKI)[X] 1-4; | [X]WO0112472 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13,15-18 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1123844 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [PX] 1-9,11-13,15-18 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0104]; figure 10 * * the whole document *; | [PA]FR2806998 (INTELLITECH INTELLIGENT TECHNO [FR]) [PA] 1-3,5-9,11-13,15-18 * the whole document * * page 23, line 9 - line 31 *; | [E]US2002128750 (KAKINAMI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [E] 1-4 * the whole document * |