EP1340948 - Storage tank for thermosyphon apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green&one&TEC&Solarindustrie GmbH Energieplatz 1 9300 St.Veit / AT | [2003/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanduth, Robert Dr. Franz Reinprecht Weg 5 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | 02 /
Lutschounig, Klaus Mühlgasse 81/3/1 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | 03 /
Schader, Gerald Keutschacher Strasse 207 9073 Viktring / AT | 04 /
Fesharaki, Morteza Harmsdorfgasse 48/C11 8042 Graz / AT | 05 /
Hofstätter, Uwe Privatgasse 3 9020 Riedlingsdorf / AT | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Schön, Theodor Patent- und Zivilingenieur Sonnleiten 7 84164 Moosthenning / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur Sonnleiten 7 84164 Moosthenning / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004259.4 | 27.02.2002 | [2003/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340948 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/34, F28D20/00 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
F28D20/0039 (EP,US);
F24S60/30 (EP,US);
F24S90/10 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0069 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/36] | Extension states | SI | 19.09.2002 | Title | German: | Speicher für Thermosiphonanlagen | [2003/36] | English: | Storage tank for thermosyphon apparatuses | [2003/36] | French: | Stockage pour systèmes à convection naturelle | [2003/36] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 12.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/46] | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/46] | Request for further processing for: | 30.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 17.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2085573 (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 1,3,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4355629 (CORNELL III S DOUGLAS) [A] 1-9* column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 26; figure - *; | [A]FR2520851 (MARSOT CHARLES LOUIS [FR]) [A] 6 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 9 *; | [Y]DE4417875 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29806517U (HOECKER HANS PETER DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 2-4,7,8 * the whole document * | Examination | DE4429838 | by applicant | EP0351220 | US5537990 |