Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3394952B | Global Dossier | 07.04.2003 | B2 | JP2002262358 | 13.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001060697 | 05.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1239690 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2005 | B1 | EP1239690 | 11.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001060697 | 05.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60204182T | 02.02.2006 | T2 | DE60204182D1 | 23.06.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001060697 | 05.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7209735 | 24.04.2007 | B2 | US2002123333 | 05.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001060697 | 05.03.2001 |