EP1239690 - Mobile communication apparatus and corresponding method for handling incoming telephone calls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hiroaki, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba Intell.Property Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004362.6 | 04.03.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | JP20010060697 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001060697 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239690 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239690 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
H04M1/663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/22] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mobilkommunikationsvorrichtung und entsprechendes Verfahren zur Behandlung ankommender Telefonanrufe | [2002/37] | English: | Mobile communication apparatus and corresponding method for handling incoming telephone calls | [2002/37] | French: | Appareil de communication mobile et procédé correspondant pour traiter des appels téléphoniques entrants | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0676884 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 1, line 50 - line 58 * * column 5, line 43 - column 7, line 25 * * figure 2 * [Y] 2-11,13-25; | [A]GB2292285 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12,23-25 * abstract ** page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 11 *; | [Y]WO9839944 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 2-11,13-25 * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 8 * * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 53 *; | [A]EP0915631 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 24 * |