EP1223169 - Agent for potentiating nerve growth factor activity containg 1,2-ethanediol derivate or salt thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 2-5, 3-chome, Nishishinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 2-5, 3-chome, Nishishinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Satoshi 2-5, Nakajima-3-chome Toyama-shi, Toyama / JP | 02 /
Maekawa, Mutsuko 65-5 Shimokumano Toyama-shi, Toyama 939 / JP | 03 /
Narita, Hirokazu 6-40 Okudahonmachi Toyama-shi, Toyama 930 / JP | 04 /
Hirata, Kazunari 80-59 Ota Toyama-shi, Toyama 939 / JP | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/29] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr., et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004782.5 | 20.10.1995 | [2002/29] | Priority number, date | JP19940284272 | 25.10.1994 Original published format: JP 28427294 | JP19940284273 | 25.10.1994 Original published format: JP 28427394 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1223169 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/54, C07D307/79, C07D417/12, C07C217/10, A61K31/38, A61K31/34, A61K31/495, A61K31/44, A61K31/535, A61K31/40 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
C07D307/79 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C217/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D453/02 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2002/29] | Title | German: | 1,2-Ethandiol-Derivate enthaltenden Wirkstoffe für die Förderung von Nervenwachstumsfaktoren und Salze davon | [2002/29] | English: | Agent for potentiating nerve growth factor activity containg 1,2-ethanediol derivate or salt thereof | [2002/29] | French: | Agents pour la potentiation de la facteur de la croissance des nerfs et l'agents qui leur contiennent | [2002/29] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/39] | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00100580.0 / EP1020427 | EP95934859.0 / EP0790246 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0383281 (TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10* page 2, line 1 - line 5; example -; claim - * |