EP1243229 - Dental implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.-medic-stom./UMF Temeschburg, Herbert Hatzlhoffer Ettlinger Strasse 67 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [2006/38] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Dr.-medic-stom./UMF Temeschburg, Herbert Hatzlhoffer Grünwettersbacher Strasse 13 76337 Waldbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/38] |
Former [2002/39] | Blumenröhr, Dietrich, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner, Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 02004827.8 | 02.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | DE2001114627 | 23.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10114627 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243229 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243229 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61B17/86 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/863 (EP);
A61C8/0022 (EP);
A61C8/005 (EP);
A61C8/0069 (EP);
A61B17/8685 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/39] | A61C8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | Zahnimplantat | [2002/39] | English: | Dental implant | [2002/39] | French: | Implant dentaire | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/01] | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4103422 (WEISS CHARLES M, et al) [A] 5,6 * column 3, lines 40-51; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2596273 (SCORTECCI GERARD [FR]) [Y] 13,14 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 2; figures 6-10 *; | [X]DE3800368 (CORE VENT CORP [US]) [X] 1,9,11,12,17 * figures 1,2,3A-3E *; | [A]EP0313222 (DETSCH STEVEN GORGAS) [A] 16* figure 2 *; | [Y]US4863383 (GRAFELMANN HANS L [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 2, lines 3-16; figure 3 *; | [A]CH684384 (STRAUMANN INST AG) [A] 15 * figure 6 *; | [XY]US5368483 (SUTTER FRANZ [CH], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * figure 1 * [Y] 13,14; | [A]US5527183 (O'BRIEN GARY [US]) [A] 1,9,11,12,16 * figure 5 *; | [XY]US5593410 (VRESPA GIUSEPPE [IT]) [X] 1,2,8 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]EP1057456 (BRESSMAN ROBERT A DR [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 5, lines 16-24 * |