EP1342611 - Flexible interior arrangement for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dale, Jonathan Maskinkajen 3 41764 Göteborg / SE | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Spitmann, Knut Hermann Volvo Car Corporation Department 91030 PVD 4:1 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Spitmann, Knut Hermann Volvo Car Corporation Department 91030 PVD 4:1 405 31 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 02004896.3 | 04.03.2002 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1342611 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/36 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
B60N2/01 (EP);
B60N2/06 (EP);
B60N2/3056 (EP);
B60N2/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flexible Innenanordnung für Fahrzeuge | [2003/37] | English: | Flexible interior arrangement for a vehicle | [2003/37] | French: | Agencement intérieur flexible pour véhicule | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3729837 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [X]EP0622268 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0899158 (PRINCE CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [Y]DE10012590 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [Y] 8,9* column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 8; figures 4-7 * |