Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
02.10.2007 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.04.2007 | First examination report | |
18.04.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.04.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.04.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.04.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.04.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.10.2003 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
13.08.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
13.08.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
28.06.2003 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.04.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
11.04.2003 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
01.11.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
26.07.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |