EP1247889 - A tarpaulin cleaning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordström, Lars Ingvar Dalbyvägen 21 S-224 60 Lund / SE | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson IPC AB, Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 02005107.4 | 07.03.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | SE20010000768 | 08.03.2001 Original published format: SE 0100768 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1247889 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1247889 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1247889 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06G1/00, B08B1/02 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
B08B1/20 (EP);
D06G1/00 (EP);
D10B2505/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | Maschine zur Reinigung einer Plane | [2002/41] | English: | A tarpaulin cleaning machine | [2002/41] | French: | Machine pour le nettoyage d'une bâche | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 21.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2006 | BE | 17.05.2006 | CH | 17.05.2006 | CY | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | IT | 17.05.2006 | LI | 17.05.2006 | NL | 17.05.2006 | TR | 17.05.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | ES | 28.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CY | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 17.08.2006 | |
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9511762 (NORDSTROEM LARS INGVAR [SE]); | [A]DE29901757U (COSTABEL ROLF [DE]); | [PA]DE20103060U (COSTABEL ROLF [DE]) |