EP1238801 - Lithographic printing plate precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunita, Kazuto Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Yanaka, Hiromitsu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005214.8 | 07.03.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | JP20010063824 | 07.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001063824 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238801 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1238801 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238801 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
B41C2201/02 (EP,US);
B41C2201/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
B41C2210/08 (EP,US);
B41C2210/20 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
B41C2210/24 (EP,US);
Y10S430/145 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Flachdruckplattenvorläufer | [2002/37] | English: | Lithographic printing plate precursor | [2002/37] | French: | Précurseur pour plaque d'impression lithographique | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2006 | BE | 17.05.2006 | CH | 17.05.2006 | CY | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | FR | 17.05.2006 | IT | 17.05.2006 | LI | 17.05.2006 | NL | 17.05.2006 | TR | 17.05.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | ES | 28.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CY | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
FR | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
FR | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 17.08.2006 | |
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0242864 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * claim - *; | [A]US4999273 (HASEGAWA AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1-17* claim - *; | [A]EP1072955 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1,4 * * paragraph [0055] * | by applicant | JPH02938397 | US2800457 | JPS4864183 | JPS4943191 | JPS5137193 | JPS5230490 | JPH09127683 | WO9910186 |