EP1219804 - Air flow rate control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd. 2477, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd. 2477, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamimura, Yasuhiro 511-11, Ichige Hitachinaka-shi / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Yasushi 1800-42, Hirano Urizuramachi Naka-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Sadayuki 40, Takahamacho 3-chome Takahagi-shi / JP | 04 /
Nagayama, Kazuo 2300-12, Kouya Hitachinaka-shi / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Straße 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | Lang, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005312.0 | 16.01.1996 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | JP19950004673 | 17.01.1995 Original published format: JP 467395 | JP19950006189 | 19.01.1995 Original published format: JP 618995 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1219804 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1219804 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D11/10 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
F02D9/105 (EP,US);
F02D9/00 (KR);
F02D11/10 (EP,US);
F02D2011/102 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0404 (EP,US);
F02D2200/602 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/27] | Title | German: | Luftströmungssteuervorrichtung | [2002/27] | English: | Air flow rate control apparatus | [2002/27] | French: | Dispositif de commande de débit d'air | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96100543.6 / EP0723072 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960100543) is 01.08.1997 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0084099 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 3 - page 3, line 10; figure 2 *; | [DA]JPH0350338 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1-3* abstract *; | [X]EP0596392 (WEBER SRL [IT]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 38; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0596392 |