EP1344956 - Pneumatic suspension and damping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behmenburg, Christof, Dr. Königsbreite 2 31867 Lauenau / DE | 02 /
Job, Heinz Ricklinger Strasse 5 31535 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
Märtens, Michael, Dr. Kleine Pfahlstrasse 7 30161 Hannover / DE | [2003/38] | Application number, filing date | 02005722.0 | 13.03.2002 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344956 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/04, B60G17/052, B60G11/27 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
F16F9/055 (EP);
B60G17/0521 (EP);
F16F9/0454 (EP);
F16F9/0472 (EP);
F16F9/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Title | German: | Pneumatische Federungs- und Dämpfungsvorrichtung | [2003/38] | English: | Pneumatic suspension and damping device | [2003/38] | French: | Dispositif de suspension et d'amortissement pneumatique | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1132013 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3046003 (SCHULTZ FORREST O E) [A] 1-10 * column 3, lines 8-11 * * column 3, lines 41-44 * * column 6, lines 30-65; figures 1,2 *; | [DX]DE2406835 (GOLD HENNING DIPL ING) [DX] 1,7 * figure 3 *; | [A]US4325541 (KOROSLADANYI JOZSEF, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4934667 (PEES JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 8 * column 6, lines 23-35; figure 8 *; | [A]DE3934821 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1* figure - * |