EP1249346 - Device for adjusting the printing image in a flexographic printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): AT, BE, IE, NL | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstrasse 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2013/10] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstrasse 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pötter, Dietmar Kortheider-Weg 73 49492 Westerkappeln / DE | 02 /
Krümpelmann, Martin Eduard-Lagemann-Strasse 22 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Andreas Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Vogel, Andreas Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel, Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005727.9 | 13.03.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | DE20011015134 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10115134 | DE20011045957 | 23.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10145957 | [2002/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1249346 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249346 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1249346 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41F13/30, B41F5/24 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
B41F5/24 (EP,US);
B41F13/20 (EP,US);
B41F13/30 (EP,US);
B41F33/0036 (EP,US);
B41F33/0045 (EP,US);
B41P2200/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Einstellung des Druckbildes in einer Flexodruckmaschine | [2002/42] | English: | Device for adjusting the printing image in a flexographic printing machine | [2002/42] | French: | Dispositif de repérage de l'image d'impression dans une machine d'impression flexographique | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05022128.2 / EP1666252 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2006
21.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE BOBST S.A. 50, route des Flumeaux 1008 Prilly / CH Opponent's representative Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge Bobst SA Industrial Property Department Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | 02
12.07.2006
12.12.2007
WITHDRAWN Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Planeta-Bogenoffset Friedrich-List-Str. 47 - 49, Postfach 02 01 64 01445 Radebeul / DE | 03
11.07.2006
11.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE Inelta Technologie GmbH Karl-Huber-Str. 3a D-85579 Neubiberg / DE | 04
12.07.2006
11.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE AVT - Advanced Vision Technology Ltd 5 Hanagar St. Ind. Z. Neve Ne'eman 45241 Hod Hasharon / IL Opponent's representative Bertsch, Florian Oliver, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2006
21.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE BOBST S.A. 50, route des Flumeaux 1008 Prilly / CH Opponent's representative Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge Bobst SA Industrial Property Department Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
02
12.07.2006
12.12.2007
WITHDRAWN Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Planeta-Bogenoffset Friedrich-List-Str. 47 - 49, Postfach 02 01 64 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
11.07.2006
11.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE Inelta Technologie GmbH Karl-Huber-Str. 3a D-85579 Neubiberg / DE | |||
04
12.07.2006
11.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE AVT - Advanced Vision Technology Ltd 5 Hanagar St. Ind. Z. Neve Ne'eman 45241 Hod Hasharon / IL Opponent's representative Bertsch, Florian Oliver, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2006
21.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE BOBST S.A. 50, route des Flumeaux 1008 Prilly / CH Opponent's representative Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge Bobst SA Industrial Property Department Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
02
12.07.2006
12.12.2007
WITHDRAWN Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Planeta-Bogenoffset Friedrich-List-Str. 47 - 49, Postfach 02 01 64 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
11.07.2006
11.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE Inelta Technologie GmbH Karl-Huber-Str. 3a D-85579 Neubiberg / DE | |||
04
12.07.2006
11.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE AVT - Advanced Vision Technology Ltd 5 Hanagar St. Ind. Z. Neve Ne'eman 45241 Hod Hasharon / IL Opponent's representative Bertsch, Florian Oliver, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
Former [2006/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE BOBST S.A. 50, route des Flumeaux 1008 Prilly / CH Opponent's representative Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge Bobst SA Industrial Property Department Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
02
12.07.2006
WITHDRAWN Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Planeta-Bogenoffset Friedrich-List-Str. 47 - 49, Postfach 02 01 64 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
11.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Inelta Technologie GmbH Karl-Huber-Str. 3a D-85579 Neubiberg / DE | |||
04
12.07.2006
AVT - Advanced Vision Technology Ltd 5 Hanagar St. Ind. Z. Neve Ne'eman 45241 Hod Hasharon / IL Opponent's representative Bertsch, Florian Oliver, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | 17.08.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.01.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | TR | 12.10.2005 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | AT | 13.03.2011 | IE | 14.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | NL | 01.10.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4121749 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [A] 1,15* the whole document *; | [PA]EP1184177 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [PA] 1,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2941521 | DE3742129 | DE4001735 |