EP1347039 - Process for Cleaning Dishes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemische Fabrik Dr. Weigert GmbH & Co. KG. Mühlenhagen 85 20539 Hamburg / DE | [2007/32] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Chemische Fabrik Dr. Weigert GmbH & Co. KG. Mühlenhagen 85 20539 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gefcken, Dieter Blumenau 162 22089 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Preugschas, Michael Steinbeker Hauptstrasse 65 22117 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Kamer, Markus Kösliner Weg 20 21465 Reinbek / DE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006099.2 | 18.03.2002 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347039 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1347039 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D7/06, C11D3/386 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP);
C11D7/06 (EP);
C11D2111/14 (EP);
C11D2111/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Geschirr | [2003/39] | English: | Process for Cleaning Dishes | [2003/39] | French: | Procédé pour le nettoyage de la vaisselle | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | IE | 08.08.2007 | TR | 08.08.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 08.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9615710 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 32; example 5; claim - *; | [X]WO9616152 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 12, line 20 - line 29; example 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0806472 (WEIGERT CHEM FAB [DE]) [A] 1-9* column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 38; claim - *; | [X]EP0808894 (WEIGERT CHEM FAB [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 9 *; | [X]WO0004117 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1 * examples I-VI * | Examination | DE3707366 |