EP1246382 - Data reproducing apparatus and data reproducing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLARION Co., Ltd. 35-2 Hakusan 5-Chome Bunkyo-ku Tokio / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states CLARION Co., Ltd. 35-2 Hakusan 5-Chome Bunkyo-ku, Tokio / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andoh, Kunihiro c/o Clarion Co., Ltd., 35-2, Hakusan 5-chome Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006114.9 | 18.03.2002 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | JP20010096282 | 29.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001096282 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1246382 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1246382 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
H04B1/082 (EP,US);
H04H60/15 (EP,US);
H04H60/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2012/25] |
Former [2012/21] | IT | ||
Former [2012/04] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Datenwiedergabegerät und Datenwiedergabesystem | [2002/40] | English: | Data reproducing apparatus and data reproducing system | [2002/40] | French: | Dispositif de reproduction de données et système de reproduction de données | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.01.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.07.2015 | 07.07.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/49] | 18.07.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0358166 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06176280 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0774695 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [X]JPH10164449 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]GB2328350 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]WO9952613 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0004688 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,3 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 29 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 13 * | Examination | WO9817032 | EP1024628 | EP1146674 | - "Profiles", SPECIFICATION OF THE BLUETOOTH SYSTEM, XX, XX, (19991201), pages 1,61 - 94,355, XP002263640 |