EP1245772 - Sliding gate with a carrying track [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woelm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Hasselbecker Strasse 2- 4 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2005/42] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Hespe & Woelm GmbH & Co. KG Hasselbecker Strasse 4 D-42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thierauf, Georg, Prof. Dr. Ing. Nöckersberg 3 45257 Essen / DE | 02 /
Baeck, Ernst, Dr. Krahnheide 13 42583 Velbert / DE | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006170.1 | 19.03.2002 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | DE20011015096 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10115096 | [2002/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1245772 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1245772 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/06, E06B11/04 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
E05D15/0617 (EP,US);
E05D15/0686 (EP,US);
E05F15/635 (EP,US);
E05F15/638 (EP);
E06B11/045 (EP);
E05Y2201/614 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | 19.03.2002 | LV | 19.03.2002 | MK | 19.03.2002 | RO | 19.03.2002 | SI | 19.03.2002 | Title | German: | Toranlage mit einem entlang mindestens eines ortsfesten Rollenbocks geführten Tragprofil | [2002/40] | English: | Sliding gate with a carrying track | [2002/40] | French: | Porte coullisant avec un profilé supportant | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.07.2005 | FI | 06.07.2005 | GB | 06.07.2005 | IE | 06.07.2005 | IT | 06.07.2005 | TR | 06.07.2005 | DK | 06.10.2005 | SE | 06.10.2005 | ES | 17.10.2005 | PT | 12.12.2005 | BE | 31.03.2006 | CH | 31.03.2006 | LI | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
IT | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
IT | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
ES | 17.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
SE | 06.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0513554 (TIESS METALLVERARBEITUNGSGESEL [AT]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 7; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0631031 (MARANTEC ANTRIEB STEUERUNG [DE]) [A] 5* figure 3 *; | [XY]EP0760415 (HESPE & WOELM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, lines 32-49; figure 2 * [Y] 6; | [A]DE29701268U (MAIER ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure 3 *; | [Y]DE19605395 (SCHULZ GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 2, lines 6-16; figure 3 * |