EP1243765 - Internal combustion engine with variable valve lift [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Atsushi, c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006191.7 | 19.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | JP20010077371 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001077371 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243765 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00, F01L1/26 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
F01L13/0021 (EP,US);
F01L1/267 (EP,US);
F01L13/0005 (EP,US);
F01L2303/01 (EP,US);
F01L2305/00 (EP,US);
F01L2800/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/24] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine mit variablem Ventilhub | [2002/39] | English: | Internal combustion engine with variable valve lift | [2002/39] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne à levée variable des soupapes | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 25.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.05.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE219529 (OTTO BECKER) [X] 1,4,5 * page 1, line 50 - page 1, line 60; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2000234533 ; | [X]US4502426 (SKELLEY JAMES H [US]) [X] 1,11 * column 1, line 7 - column 1, line 14 * * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 52; figure 1 *; | [X]US4901684 (WRIDE DONALD C [AU]) [X] 1,10,12 * column 2, line 45 - column 2, line 68; figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 6 *; | [X]US5003939 (KING BRIAN T [CA]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 14 * * column 6, line 17 - column 6, line 66 * * column 7, line 55 - column 7, line 59; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]DE4342806 (LANGE PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 52 - column 1, line 57; figures 1,2; claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]US5501186 (HARA SEINOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0950799 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 4* figures 1,2; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000234533 A 20000829 (UNISIA JECS CORP;NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |