EP1219894 - Pulverized coal burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichinose, Toshimitsu, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Nagasaki R&D Center, 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 02 /
Okamoto, Akiyasu, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Nagasaki R&D Center, 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Takeshi, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Nagasaki R&D Center, 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 04 /
Oguri, Masaharu, c/o Choryo Engineering Co., Ltd. 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | [2005/51] |
Former [2002/27] | 01 /
Ichinose, Toshimitsu, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Nagasaki R&D Center, 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Okamota, Akiyasu, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Nagasaki R&D Center, 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Takeshi, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Nagasaki R&D Center, 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Oguri, Masaharu, c/o Choryo Engineering Co., Ltd. 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006379.8 | 29.07.1998 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1219894 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219894 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F23C5/32, F23D1/00 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
F23D1/00 (EP);
F23C5/32 (EP);
F23D2201/101 (EP);
F23D2201/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, NL [2002/27] | Title | German: | Kohlenstaubbrenner | [2002/27] | English: | Pulverized coal burner | [2002/27] | French: | Brûleur à charbon pulvérisé | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98114219.3 / EP0976977 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE890254 (KOHLENSCHEIDUNGS GMBH) [A] 1 * page 2, line 55 - line 59; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0405294 (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]US5315939 (RINI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1* column 15, line 66 - column 16, line 45; figure 5 * |