Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
08.07.2005 | Change - representative | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
15.04.2005 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
08.04.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.01.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
20.01.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
16.08.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
13.04.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.02.2004 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
24.01.2004 | Change - applicant | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] |
03.12.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.12.2003 | Deletion: Reply to examination report | |
05.09.2003 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
27.08.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
27.08.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
09.05.2003 | First examination report | |
06.05.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
25.04.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] |
14.03.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
09.08.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |