EP1243635 - High-speed charge transport material, production method thereof, photoelectric conversion device and electroluminescence device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | ||
For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | |||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states JSR Corporation 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | ||
For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Masaaki, c/o JSR Corporation 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | 02 /
Ukon, Masakatsu, c/o JSR Corporation 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Tsuyoshi, c/o JSR Microelectronics, Inc. 1280 North Mathilda Ave. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 04 /
Shimizu, Yo, Nat. Inst. of Av. Ind. Sc. & Tech. Kansai, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8577 / JP | 05 /
Monobe, Hirosato, Nat. Inst. of Av. Ind. Sc. & Te. Kansai, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8577 / JP | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006483.8 | 22.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | JP20010084956 | 23.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001084956 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243635 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243635 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/38 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C09K19/3838 (EP,US);
C09K19/3861 (EP,US);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US);
C09K2323/04 (EP,US);
Y10S428/917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/24] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hochgeschwindigkeitsladungstransportmaterial, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, photoelektrische Umwandlungsvorrichtung und elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung | [2002/39] | English: | High-speed charge transport material, production method thereof, photoelectric conversion device and electroluminescence device | [2002/39] | French: | Matériau de transport de charges à haute vitesse, son procédé de production, dispositif de conversion photoélectrique et dispositif électroluminescent | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0385329 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * page 10 - page 13; claim - *; | [XA]US5730903 (OKAZAKI MASAKI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 27, line 6 - line 15; example 6 * [A] 4-7; | [A]US5736068 (HAEUSSLING LUKAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9932537 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7* page 12 - page 22; claim - *; | [XY] - OKAZAKI M ET AL, "POLYMERIZABLE DISCOTICNEMATIC TRIPHENYLENE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR APPLICATION TO AN OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC FILM", POLYMERS FOR ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, CHICHESTER, GB, (200008), vol. 11, no. 8-12, ISSN 1042-7147, pages 398 - 403, XP000977311 [X] 1-3 * page 400; figure 2 * [Y] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1099-1581(200008/12)11:8/12<398::AID-PAT40>3.0.CO;2-2 | [A] - WERTH M ET AL, "THE ROLE OF THE SPACER IN DISCOTIC POLYMERS", MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, HUTHIG UND WEPF VERLAG. BASEL, CH, (19930601), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 329 - 338, XP000381623 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.1993.030140602 | [A] - BLEYL I ET AL, "Photopolymerization and transport properties of liquid crystalline triphenylenes", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 5974275, XP002200876 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [ ] - 16TH INTERNATIONAL LIQUID CRYSTAL CONFERENCE, KENT, OH, USA, 24-28 JUNE 1996, Molecular Crystals and Liquid Crystals, 1997, Gordon & Breach, Switzerland, vol. 299, ISSN 1058-725X, pages 149 - 155 |