EP1243959 - Hinge connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rodenstock GmbH Isartalstrasse 43 80469 München / DE | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Rodenstock GmbH Isartalstrasse 43 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Rodenstock GmbH (HRB 106703) Postfach 14 04 40 80454 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states Rodenstock GmbH IsartalStrasse 43 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Optische Werke G. Rodenstock Isartalstrasse 43 80469 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Ekkehart Gersteckerstrasse 63 a 81827 München / DE | [2002/39] | Application number, filing date | 02006705.4 | 22.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | DE2001114272 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10114272 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243959 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243959 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243959 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/22 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
G02C5/008 (EP);
G02C5/2209 (EP);
G02C2200/16 (EP);
G02C2200/20 (EP);
G02C2200/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | Scharnierverbindung | [2002/39] | English: | Hinge connection | [2002/39] | French: | Connection à charnière | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | FR | 18.01.2006 | GB | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | IT | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | AT | 22.03.2006 | BE | 31.03.2006 | CH | 31.03.2006 | LI | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
FR | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
AT | 22.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
AT | 22.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
AT | 22.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/46] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
AT | 22.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 29.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR954467 (A. CORNELY) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE3404511 (WUENSCH HELMUT) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US4780928 (DE LORENZO POZ MARIO [IT]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 18 - line 62 *; | [A]US4978209 (OHBA TOYOHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 22 *; | [A]WO9411774 (MUGNIER DESIGN [US]) [A] 1 * page 19, line 5 - line 28; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0607114 (SILHOUETTE INT GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]FR2703477 (PIARD GERARD [FR]) [A] 1,5 * claim - * |