EP1221378 - Ink-jet image forming device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Finetech Inc. 5540-11 Sakate-machi Mitsukaido-shi, Ibaraki / JP | [2004/13] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states COPYER CO., LTD. No. 3-3, Shimorenjaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Iwao c/o Copyer Co. Ltd., 3-3, Shimoren jaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Namekata, Kiyokazu c/o Copyer Co. Ltd., 3-3, Shimoren jaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Murakami, Kazuhiro c/o Copyer Co. Ltd., 3-3, Shimoren jaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nisimura, Kazuhiro c/o Copyer Co. Ltd., 3-3, Shimoren jaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Ryoma c/o Copyer Co. Ltd., 3-3, Shimoren jaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Izuma, Kensuke c/o Copyer Co. Ltd., 3-3, Shimoren jaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Kiyohara, Naoki c/o Copyer Co. Ltd., 3-3, Shimoren jaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Sasame, Satoru c/o Copyer Co. Ltd., 3-3, Shimoren jaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02006740.1 | 21.01.1997 | [2002/28] | Priority number, date | JP19960026255 | 22.01.1996 Original published format: JP 2625596 | JP19960045711 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: JP 4571196 | JP19960047834 | 05.03.1996 Original published format: JP 4783496 | JP19960139056 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13905696 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1221378 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1221378 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/14 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
B41J13/14 (EP,US);
B41J11/005 (EP,US);
B41J11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/20] |
Former [2002/28] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Tintenstrahlbilderzeugung | [2002/28] | English: | Ink-jet image forming device | [2002/28] | French: | Dispositif de formation d'images par impression à jet d'encre | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97900468.6 / EP0876913 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0761078 ; | [X]JPH04366639 ; | [X]JPS58179673 ; | [X]US5065169 (VINCENT KENT D [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, paragraph L - column 4, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07061078 A 19950307 (CANON INC) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930517), vol. 017, no. 244, Database accession no. (M - 1410), & JP04366639 A 19921218 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840127), vol. 008, no. 020, Database accession no. (M - 271), & JP58179673 A 19831020 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * |