EP1348838 - Exhaust gas purification apparatus and method for regeneration of a particulate filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rusch, Klaus Schimmelsgraben 6 96123 Litzendorf / DE | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2003/40] | Application number, filing date | 02006946.4 | 26.03.2002 | [2003/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1348838 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/035, F01N3/023, F01N3/025, F01N3/029, F01N3/027, F01N3/20 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
F01N3/0231 (EP);
F01N3/0253 (EP);
F01N3/027 (EP);
F01N3/029 (EP);
F01N3/035 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2004/26] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Abgasreinigungsanlage und Verfahren zur Regeneration eines Filters für partikelbelbeladene Gasströme | [2003/40] | English: | Exhaust gas purification apparatus and method for regeneration of a particulate filter | [2003/40] | French: | Dispositif de purification de gaz d'échappement et procédé de régénération d'un filtre à particules | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 23.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6004520 (HARTWEG MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * column 2, line 6 - line 36 * * column 4, line 57 - line 59; figure 1 *[A] 12,14,15; | [Y]EP1072763 (RENAULT [FR]) [Y] 8,9,16 * paragraph [0044]; figure . *; | [Y]WO0196717 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 10,11,17,18 * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 19; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE10035544 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,12-14 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0029]; figure 4 * [Y] 8-11,16-18 | by applicant | DE3608838 | DE19748561 |