EP1246343 - Connections of salient pole windings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyake, Nobuaki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Nakahara, Yuji c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Hashiguchi, Naoki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
Takai, Keiji c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/40] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007040.5 | 27.03.2002 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | JP20010095418 | 29.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001095418 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1246343 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1246343 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/52, H02K1/14 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
H02K3/522 (EP);
H02K1/14 (KR);
H02K1/18 (KR);
H02K2203/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/40] | H02K3/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/23] |
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kontaktierung von Statorwicklungen einer Maschine mit ausgeprägten Polen | [2002/40] | English: | Connections of salient pole windings | [2002/40] | French: | Connexions des enroulements d'un stator à pôles saillants | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9844616 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 6, paragraph LAST - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3; | [Y]EP0969581 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0088]; figures 31-34 *; | [A]JPH11187630 ; | [X]JPH09191588 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11187630 A 19990709 (SANKO KIKI KK) [A] 3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09191588 A 19970722 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |