EP1247629 - Apparatus for forming tiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecno Europa S.R.L. Via Marchesi, 11 41043 Formigine / IT | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fiandri, Giancarlo Via Nuova, 24 41030 Prigano sulla Secchia / IT | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Luppi, Luigi Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41100 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Luppi, Luigi Luppi & Crugnola S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 02007134.6 | 28.03.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | IT2001MO00063 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: IT MO010063 | [2002/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1247629 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1247629 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B28B13/02 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
B28B13/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/27] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Fliesen | [2002/41] | English: | Apparatus for forming tiles | [2002/41] | French: | Dispositif pour la fabrication de carreaux | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/03] | 06.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.05.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0300532 (MOSA KONINKL BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2688162 (DEMLER SA [FR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO9856551 (FRANCESCHINI ALBERTO [EG]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 12 - page 6, line 5; figure 1 *; | [EL]EP1302289 (TECNO EUROPA SRL [IT]) [EL] 1-24 * the whole document * |