EP1249210 - Pin for forming a hole for inserting an indwelling needle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka-fu, 531-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 531-8510 / JP | ||
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu, 531-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishihara, Jun Nextier Company Limited, 679-6, Kawanarijima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken 416-0939 / JP | 02 /
Toma, Shigeki c/o Toma Clinic, 972, Azakouchi Nishihara-cho Nakagami-gun, Okinawa-ken 903-0116 / JP | 03 /
Sano, Yoshihiko Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 531-8510 / JP | 04 /
Masuda, Toshiaki Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 531-8510 / JP | 05 /
Ishida, Masashi 36-3, Tanakahigashitakahara-cho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 606-8243 / JP | 06 /
Harada, Kazuyoshi Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 531-8510 / JP | [2007/52] |
Former [2002/42] | 01 /
Ishihara, Jun Nextier Company Limited, 679-6, Kawanarijima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken 416-0939 / JP | ||
02 /
Toma, Shigeki c/o Toma Clinic, 972, Azakouchi Nishihara-cho Nakagami-gun, Okinawa-ken 903-0116 / JP | |||
03 /
Sano, Yoshihiko Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 531-8510 / JP | |||
04 /
Masuda, Toshiaki Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 531-8510 / JP | |||
05 /
Ishida, Masashi 36-3, Tanakahigashitakahara-cho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 606-8243 / JP | |||
06 /
Harada, Kazuyoshi Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 531-8510 / JP | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007220.3 | 27.03.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | JP20010115747 | 13.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001115747 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1249210 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249210 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61B17/3415 (EP,US);
A61M1/3655 (EP,US);
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M1/3653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/28] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Stift für Durchgangsformerhaltung zur Einführung einer Verweilnadel | [2002/42] | English: | Pin for forming a hole for inserting an indwelling needle | [2002/42] | French: | Goupille pour garder le passage pour une aiguille à demeure | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL6614673 (R. BRUMMELKAMP) [A] 1 * page 5, line 15 - line 27 * * page 6, line 5 - line 11 * * figure - *; | [A]US5326350 (LI SHU-TUNG [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 25 - line 59 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5372583 (ROBERTS CRAIG P [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 20 - line 31 * * figure - *; | [A]DE4429230 (HARREN ERNST DIETHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9706734 (MACROPHARM GES FUER PHARMAZEUT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19639615 (BRAINLAB MED COMPUTERSYST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 13, line 66 - column 14, line 11 ** figures 7-10 *; | [XA]US5904703 (GILSON PAUL [IE]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 8 - line 15 * * figures 12,13 * [A] 2-5; | [A]WO9952444 (MTI PRECISION PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 9, line 20 - line 24 * * page 13, line 2 - line 5 * * figures 1-4 * | Examination | JP2000176009 |