EP1247573 - Catalyst for polymerizing olefin and process for polymerizing olefin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/41] | Component of catalyst for polymerizing olefin, catalyst for polymerizing olefin and process for polymerizing olefin | ||
[2008/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Polypropylene Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Japan Polychem Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Japan Polychem Corporation 10-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Japan Polychem Corporation, Catalyst Research & Development Center 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Tadashi, Japan Polychem Corp. Catalyst Res. & Dev. Center, 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007331.8 | 04.04.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | JP20010106998 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001106998 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1247573 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1247573 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/12, B01J21/14, B01J35/00, C08F4/6592, C08F4/76, C08F10/00 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/025 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/64044 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/64048 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/65916 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7006 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7022 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7042 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/76 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2002/41] | B01J21/12, B01J21/14, B01J21/06, B01J35/00, C08F10/00, C08F4/76, C08F4/64, C08F4/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | Katalysator für Olefinpolymerisation und Verfahren zur Olefinpolymerisation | [2008/50] | English: | Catalyst for polymerizing olefin and process for polymerizing olefin | [2008/50] | French: | Catalyseur pour la polymérisation d'oléfines et procédé de polymérisation d'oléfines | [2008/50] |
Former [2002/41] | Katalysatorbestandteil für Olefinpolymerisation, Katalysator für Olefinpolymerisation und Verfahren zur Olefinpolymerisation | ||
Former [2002/41] | Component of catalyst for polymerizing olefin, catalyst for polymerizing olefin and process for polymerizing olefin | ||
Former [2002/41] | Composant de catalyseur pour la polymérisation d'oléfines, catalyseur pour la polymérisation d'oléfines et procédé de polymérisation d'oléfines | Examination procedure | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.2009 | BE | 21.10.2009 | CY | 21.10.2009 | DK | 21.10.2009 | FI | 21.10.2009 | IT | 21.10.2009 | NL | 21.10.2009 | SE | 21.10.2009 | TR | 21.10.2009 | GR | 22.01.2010 | ES | 01.02.2010 | PT | 22.02.2010 | GB | 04.04.2010 | IE | 04.04.2010 | LU | 04.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
NL | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.04.2010 | ||
IE | 04.04.2010 | ||
LU | 04.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.04.2010 | ||
IE | 04.04.2010 | ||
LU | 04.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.04.2010 | ||
IE | 04.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
GB | 04.04.2010 | ||
IE | 04.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
IE | 04.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
IE | 04.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
IE | 04.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 21.10.2009 | |
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 01.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4247669 (REGINATO LUIGI, et al) [X] 1,4,5 * examples 1,14 *; | [X]US4312967 (NORWOOD DONALD D, et al) [X] 1,4,5 * example I, catalyst A *;; example II * * column 4, line 15 - line 41 *; | [X]US4396533 (JOHNSTONE ALEXANDER [GB]) [X] 1,4,5 * examples 1,2 *; | [XY]US5024982 (HAWLEY GIL P [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 15, line 59 - line 61; example III * [Y] 1,4,5; | [X]WO9408914 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1 * examples 17,18 *; | [X]US5808136 (TACKE THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1 * example 17 *; | [Y]EP0965599 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4,5 * examples 1,2 * * page 3, line 39 - line 41 *; | [X]US6103207 (CHATTHA MOHINDER S [US], et al) [X] 1 * example 6 *; | [PX]WO0132309 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US], et al) [PX] 1,4,5 * claims 1,3,5,7,9,10 * * example 1, run 102, table 2 * * example 4, runs 402-405, table 4 ** example 5, run 103, table 5 *; | [E]WO0234390 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [E] 1 * example 22 *; | [X] - BAPTISTELLA L H B ET AL, "Chromium (VI) Adsorbed on SiO2/ZrO2, a New Supported Reagent for Allylic Oxidations", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990402), vol. 40, no. 14, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 2695 - 2698, XP004160284 [X] 1 * page 2695, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(99)00335-4 | [X] - SRINIVASAN S. ET AL., "The Formation of Titanium Oxide Monolayer Coatings on Silica Surfaces", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (1991), vol. 131, pages 260 - 275, XP002208490 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 261, paragraph EXPERIMENTAL - page 262, column L * * page 264, paragraph RESULTS - page 265, column R * * page 272, paragraph SUMMARY * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9517(91)90343-3 |