19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
28.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
25.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
04.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
04.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
14.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
27.08.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
30.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
18.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
07.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
30.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
18.09.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
04.08.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.08.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.11.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
13.11.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
13.11.2008 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
17.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
03.06.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
16.02.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
07.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.09.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
10.09.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
15.07.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.05.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
28.02.2003 |
First examination report |
|
26.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.12.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
15.11.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
23.08.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] |