EP1249871 - Radiation detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2008/38] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho, Nagoya-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Kenji Shimadzu Co., 1,Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604, 8511 / JP | 02 /
Yoshimuta, Toshimori Shimadzu Co., 1,Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604, 8511 / JP | 03 /
Tokuda, Satoshi Shimadzu Co., 1,Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604, 8511 / JP | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/42] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007671.7 | 04.04.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | JP20010113592 | 12.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001113592 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249871 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249871 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249871 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H01L31/115 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
H01L31/0216 (EP,US);
G01T1/24 (KR);
H01L27/14676 (EP,US);
H01L31/0203 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | H01L27/146, H01L31/0216 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2006/41] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Strahlungsdetektor | [2002/42] | English: | Radiation detector | [2002/42] | French: | Détecteur de radiation | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6171643 (POLISCHUK BRADLEY TRENT [CA], et al) [A] 1-9* column 8, line 18 - column 11, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1079437 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] - [0027]; figure 2 * |