EP1250938 - Odor absorption and deodorization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goldschmidt Chemical Corporation 914 East Randolph Road Hopewell, Virginia 23860 / US | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shoaib, Arif 4129 Leitrim Court Dublin, OH 43016 / IE | 02 /
Raushanah, Rinehart 7485 Swindon Street Blacklick, OH 43004 / IE | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Rotenberg, Klaus c/o Goldschmidt GmbH Patentabteilung Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Rotenberg, Klaus, Dr. c/o Th. Goldschmidt AG Patentabteilung Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007687.3 | 05.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | US20010837790 | 18.04.2001 Original published format: US 837790 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1250938 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1250938 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/01, C11D3/20, C11D1/44, A01K1/015 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
C11D3/2079 (EP,US);
A61L9/01 (EP,US);
C11D1/44 (EP,US);
C11D3/0031 (EP,US);
C11D3/0068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Title | German: | Geruchsabsorption und Desodorisierung | [2002/43] | English: | Odor absorption and deodorization | [2002/43] | French: | Absorption des odeurs et désodorisation | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2738747 (CONCEPTAIR ANSTALT [LI]) [A] 1-9 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 28 ** example - *; | [A]WO0112145 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, paragraph L * * page 5, paragraphs 3-7 * * page 6, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 11, paragraph 4 * |