EP1248320 - Power supply connector adapted to also operate as a lamp-support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIFFI Luce S.R.L. Via delle Industrie, 14 20040 Busnago (MILANO) / IT | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piva, Paolo Francesco, Dott. Arch. Via Delle Industrie 14 20040 Busnago (Milano) / IT | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02007718.6 | 05.04.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI00200 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: IT MI20010200 | [2002/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1248320 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1248320 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26, H01R12/08 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
H01R12/67 (EP);
H01R9/26 (EP);
H01R4/2483 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/41] | H01R9/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | Stromzuführungsverbinder also geeignet zum Betrieb als Lampenträger | [2002/41] | English: | Power supply connector adapted to also operate as a lamp-support | [2002/41] | French: | Connecteur d'alimentation adapté pour opérer aussi comme support de lampes | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB975161 (GOTTFRIED GLASEL) [X] 1,9,13-15 * figures 1,2,5; claim 1 * [Y] 2-8,10-12,16-19; | [Y]WO9503615 (STOLL ALWIN KABELKONFEKTION AG [CH], et al) [Y] 5,10,11 * page 13; figure 19 *; | [Y]DE19703174 (MURJAHN KG VLM [DE]) [Y] 12 * abstract *; | [Y]US5860832 (WAYT ROGER W [US], et al) [Y] 2-4* abstract *; | [Y]US5944463 (SAVAGE JR JOHN M [US]) [Y] 6-8,17 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 6; figures 9,19 *; | [Y]DE19917709 (KALTHOFF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 16,18,19 * abstract * |