EP1355371 - Adapter as alternative for a fuel cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SFC Smart Fuel Cell AG Eugen-Sänger-Ring 4 85649 Brunnthal-Nord / DE | [2007/17] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states SFC Smart Fuel Cell AG Eugen-Sänger-Strasse, Gebäude 53.0 85649 Brunnthal-Nord / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Jens, Dr. Tsingtauer Strasse 61 81827 München / DE | 02 /
Stefener, Manfred Adelgundenstrasse 21 80538 München / DE | [2007/24] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
Müller, Jens, Dr. Tsingtauer Strasse 61 85649 Brunnthal-Nord / DE | ||
02 /
Stefener, Manfred Adelgundenstrasse 21 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
Müller, Jens, Dr. Gorch-Fock-Strasse 5 81827 München / DE | ||
02 /
Stefener, Manfred Kathreinweg 14 81827 München / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008035.4 | 10.04.2002 | [2003/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1355371 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355371 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Title | German: | Adapter als Alternative für eine Brennstoffpatrone | [2003/43] | English: | Adapter as alternative for a fuel cartridge | [2003/43] | French: | Adaptateur comme alternative pour une cartouche à combustible | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 13.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | IE | 13.06.2007 | IT | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | IE | 13.06.2007 | |
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | IE | 13.06.2007 | |
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | SE | 13.09.2007 | |
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3476158 (RETZLER WILLIAM) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4545759 (GILES GEORGE B [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,7,9,12,13 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 60 * * figure 5 *; | [X]JPH06310166 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,3,7,9,12,13 * abstract *; | [X]EP0813264 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,9,10,12,13 * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 3 * * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 49 * * figures 1,3,4,6 *; | [X]US6268077 (KELLEY RONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,9,12,13 * column 3, line 18 - line 45 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6326097 (HOCKADAY ROBERT G [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 8, line 23 - column 10, line 21 ** figures 7A,7B,9 *; | [E]EP1197299 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [E] 1,3,7,9,12,13 * figures 2-4 * |