EP1251146 - Siloxane elastomer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Getzner Werkstoffe Holding GmbH Herrenau 5, Postfach 6706 Bürs/Bludenz / AT | [2006/37] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Getzner Werkstoffe Holding GmbH Herrenau 5, Postfach 6706 Bürs/Bludenz / AT | ||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Getzner Werkstoffe GmbH Herrenau 5, Postfach 6706 Bürs/Bludenz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stolz, Andreas, Dr. Alte Strasse 11 6710 Nenzing / AT | 02 /
Dietrich, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Fritz-Tölsch-Weg 7 6830 Rankweil / AT | 03 /
Danner, Elisabeth Hinterachmühle 12 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 04 /
Stocker, Kathrin St. Gallenkirch 12b 6791 St. Gallenkirch / AT | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Gössmann, Christoph Tassilo, et al Patentanwalt Innstrasse 19 84453 Mühldorf/Inn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Gössmann, Christoph Tassilo, et al Patentanwalt, Innstrasse 19 84453 Mühldorf/Inn / DE | ||
Former [2002/43] | Gössmann, Christoph Innstrasse 19 84453 Mühldorf/Inn / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008205.3 | 17.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | DE2001119583 | 19.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10119583 | [2002/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1251146 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251146 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/458, C08G77/46, C08G77/16, C08G18/28, C08G18/50, C08G18/61, C08G18/83 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
C08G18/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Title | German: | Siloxan-Elastomer | [2002/43] | English: | Siloxane elastomer | [2002/43] | French: | Elastomère de Siloxane | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.2007
20.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Huntsman International LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US Opponent's representative Van den Broeck, Kristel Alice, et al, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [2011/48] |
Former [2009/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.2007
20.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Huntsman International LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US Opponent's representative Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H., et al, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | ||
Former [2007/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.2007
Huntsman International LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US Opponent's representative Baken, Philippus Johannes L. H., et al, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 B-3078 Everberg / BE | 18.07.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.09.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/25] | Appeal following opposition | 22.07.2009 | Appeal received No. T1535/09 | 02.10.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.09.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | ES | 24.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | LU | 17.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | AT | 17.04.2011 | FI | 17.04.2011 | GB | 17.04.2011 | IT | 17.04.2011 | IE | 18.04.2011 | SE | 18.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | DK | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | FR | 02.05.2011 | DE | 01.11.2011 | NL | 01.11.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/42] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
TR | 13.09.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
LU | 17.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/37] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
LU | 17.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | GR | 14.12.2006 | |
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | GR | 14.12.2006 | |
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | ES | 24.12.2006 | |
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | IT | 13.09.2006 | |
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | ES | 24.12.2006 | |
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 24.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0380236 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,12 * example - *; | [X]US5356706 (SHORES A ANDREW [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-12 * example 1 * * column 8, line 52 - column 8, line 65 ** column 10, line 3 - column 10, line 25 *; | [X]WO9521206 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-12 * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 19 * * page 12, line 15 - page 12, line 27; example 6 *; | [X]WO9903863 (CARDIAC CRC NOMINEES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * examples 1,3-6 * |