Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002329277 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0210195 | 11.09.2002 | EP02008422 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03087438 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02008422 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1361297 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2004 | B1 | EP1361297 | 12.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02008422 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE272133T | 15.08.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP02008422 | 12.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50200704D1 | 02.09.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP02008422 | 12.04.2002 |