EP1361297 - Method for cleaning and passivation of the surfaces of zinc or zincalloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz, Wolf-Dieter Brahmsweg 15 82538 Geretsried / DE | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Szynka, Dirk, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Szynka, Dirk, et al König-Szynka-von Renesse Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 9 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008422.4 | 12.04.2002 | [2003/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361297 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361297 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C25F1/00, C25D11/36, C25D11/34 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
C25F1/00 (EP);
C25D11/34 (EP);
C25D11/36 (EP);
C25D5/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | SI | 14.02.2003 | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reinigen und Passivieren von Zink- und Zinklegierungsoberflächen | [2003/46] | English: | Method for cleaning and passivation of the surfaces of zinc or zincalloys | [2003/46] | French: | Procédé pour nettoyage et passivation des couches de zinc ou des alliages de zinc | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 16.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 28.07.2004 | GB | 28.07.2004 | IE | 28.07.2004 | NL | 28.07.2004 | TR | 28.07.2004 | DK | 28.10.2004 | GR | 28.10.2004 | SE | 28.10.2004 | ES | 08.11.2004 | PT | 28.12.2004 | CY | 12.04.2005 | LU | 12.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/27] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
GB | 28.07.2004 | ||
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
NL | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
CY | 12.04.2005 | ||
LU | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
GB | 28.07.2004 | ||
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
NL | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
CY | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
GB | 28.07.2004 | ||
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
NL | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
GB | 28.07.2004 | ||
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
NL | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
GB | 28.07.2004 | ||
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
ES | 08.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 28.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60248898 ; | [A]US3663386 (OTRHALEK JOSEPH V, et al) [A] * column 1, lines 5-10; example II *; | [A]US3716462 (JENSEN D) [A] * abstract *; | [X]US4133724 (HARTNAGEL HANS L, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, lines 25-60 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860508), vol. 010, no. 123, Database accession no. (C - 344), & JP60248898 A 19851209 (CHIYOUBEE TAGUCHI) [A] * abstract * |