EP1357247 - Storage device for valuables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garny Sicherheitstechnik GmbH Dreieichstrasse 12-16 64546 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbert, Manfred Bleichstrasse 2 64579 Gernsheim / DE | 02 /
Lücke, Detlef Schusterwörthstrasse 38 64560 Riedstadt / DE | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Fröbelweg 1 64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008613.8 | 17.04.2002 | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1357247 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E05G1/06 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
E05G1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/30] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wertdepoteinrichtung | [2003/44] | English: | Storage device for valuables | [2003/44] | French: | Dispositif pour le dépôt d'objets de valeur | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.07.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2585153 (DESGORCES JEAN [FR]) [Y] 3-6 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 6; figure . *; | [XY]FR2613411 (HAFFNER CIE SA P [FR]) [X] 1,2,7-11 * the whole document * [Y] 3-6,20; | [A]FR2669313 (HAFFNER TECH SA [FR]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]DE19728272 (LEICHER GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MUELLER E, "DAS MIETFACH, DAS ZUM KUNDEN KOMMT / DER SAFEFACH-AUTOMAT DM 5... - MEHR BEQUEMLICHKEIT, MEHR SICHERHEIT UND VIEL MEHR EFFIZIENZ", W & S. WIRTSCHAFTSSCHUTZ UND SICHERHEITSTECHNIK, KRIMINASTIK VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, (199111), no. 11, ISSN 0173-3303, pages 1053 - 1054,1056, XP000296986 [Y] 20 * the whole document * |