EP1251458 - Semiconductor integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakane, George 5-9-23, Jingu Nara-shi, Nara 631-0804 / JP | 02 /
Sumi, Tatsumi 1-2-20-401, Kosobecho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1115 / JP | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008649.2 | 17.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | JP20010120424 | 19.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001120424 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251458 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251458 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
G06K19/0701 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/39] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Integrierte Halbleiterschaltung | [2002/43] | English: | Semiconductor integrated circuit | [2002/43] | French: | Circuit intégré à semi-conducteur | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2751148 (INSIDE TECHNOLOGIES [FR]); | [Y]EP0897162 (KIPP LUDWIG [US]); | [XY]WO9957681 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [X]US6070804 (MIYAMOTO TAIYUU [JP]) |