EP1262618 - Goods security apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HIGH-SCAN-Artikelsicherungs-GmbH Feuerbachweg 13 41469 Neuss / DE | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stroh, Harald Rikarda-Huch-Weg 10 414469 Neuss / DE | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008693.0 | 18.04.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | DE2001126288 | 29.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10126288 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262618 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1262618 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262618 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05B73/00 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
G08B13/1463 (EP,US);
E05B73/0017 (EP,US);
Y10S206/806 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5004 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5031 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/19] |
Former [2004/18] | |||
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Warensicherungsvorrichtung | [2002/49] | English: | Goods security apparatus | [2002/49] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité de biens | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | IE | 05.04.2006 | TR | 05.04.2006 | LU | 18.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
TR | 05.04.2006 | ||
LU | 18.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
IT | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4187509 (WEINER ARNOLD [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 15 - line 28 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 7; figures 9,10 *; | [A]EP0212061 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4670950 (WISECUP DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 52 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]CH667339 (SCANMATIC SECURITY SYSTEMS AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4987754 (MINASY ARTHUR J [US], et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5437172 (LAMY PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2756468 (SPIELMAN LIONEL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 6; figure 5; claim 9 *; | [Y]WO9840591 (AARTS MATHIEU [NL]) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, line 28 - line 35; figure 1 * |