EP1251628 - Stator pole winding method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIS SpA 50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa (Firenze) / IT | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becherucci, Raffaele Via San Zanobi, 7 Casignano, Scandicci, 50018 Firenze / IT | 02 /
Stratico, Gianfranco Via Antonio Lombardi,32 53100 Siena / IT | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02008700.3 | 18.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | US20010285064P | 19.04.2001 Original published format: US 285064 P | US20020122710 | 12.04.2002 Original published format: US 122710 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251628 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251628 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/095 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
H02K15/095 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49009 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bewicklen von Statorpolen | [2002/43] | English: | Stator pole winding method and apparatus | [2002/43] | French: | Procédé et appareil de fabrication d'enroulements de pôles statoriques | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0780768 ; | [A]JPH07107686 ; | [A]GB191026225 (BROOKS BOULTBEE, et al) [A] 1,9 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US1503254 (SIPPEL ERNEST H, et al) [Y] 1,4-25 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1518209 (MCCORD CLAUDE M) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US1661331 (GOMORY ALBERT B) [A] 1 * figures 3-6 *; | [A]US2275995 (SCHNEIDER EMMOR V) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2394529 (CHARLES ARPURTH) [A] 1 * figures 1-12 * * page 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07080768 A 19950328 (SHIBAURA ENG WORKS CO LTD) [Y] 1-25 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07107686 A 19950421 (SHIBAURA ENG WORKS CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |